Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathias Lu Zhengshen

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1919Born
17 Apr 198162.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Mar 198263.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow], China
4 Jan 2002³82.9DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mathias Lu Zhengshen
Bishop Mathias Lu Zhengshen (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow]

  • a priest for 20.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast