Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Fan Zhong-Liang, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1918Born
23 Aug 193820.6EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
31 May 195133.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
27 Feb 198567.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China
12 Mar 200082.1SucceededBishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China
16 Mar 201496.1DiedBishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Fan Zhong-Liang
Bishop Joseph Fan Zhong-Liang S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMeilong Town
Death PlaceShanghai, Diocese of Shanghai [Shanghai]

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Sep 2018
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2015, Page 1,143
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,299
  • bd/sj: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast