Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Lagumina

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Palermo

Titular Archbishop of Carpathus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1855BornPalermo
16 Dec 192065.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
16 Dec 192065.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Samos
26 Dec 192065.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samos
15 Jul 192974.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
15 Jul 192974.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Carpathus
5 May 193175.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Lagumina:
Bishop Giuseppe Lagumina (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Palermo

  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1932
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,042
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015