Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leovigildo López Fitoria, C.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1927 BornBoaco
11 Jul 195427.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
7 Jul 197245.1AppointedBishop of Granada, Nicaragua
7 Oct 197245.3Ordained BishopBishop of Granada, Nicaragua
15 Dec 200376.5RetiredBishop of Granada, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Leovigildo López Fitoria:
Bishop Leovigildo López Fitoria C.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Granada

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Granada.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013