Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wolfgang von Hausen

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1553Born
19 Dec 160047.9SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
14 Jan 160249.0ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
21 Apr 160249.3Ordained BishopBishop of Regensburg, Germany
3 Sep 161360.6DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wolfgang von Hausen
Bishop Wolfgang von Hausen (born 1553, died ) Bishop of Regensburg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRegensburg, Diocese of Regensburg

  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1602, Number 8
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,474
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 63, Number 4,825

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast