Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Baptist Pichlmair

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Halmiros


Events

DateEventTitle
15 May 1579AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
15 May 1579AppointedTitular Bishop of Halmiros
30 Aug 1579Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Halmiros
30 Sep 1604DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Baptist Pichlmair (VIAF: 62607193)
Bishop Johann Baptist Pichlmair (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRegensburg

  • a bishop for 25.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1579, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast