Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Markus von Aldringen

Deceased

Bishop of Seckau, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1592Born
25 Aug 163340.8AppointedBishop of Seckau, Austria
28 Aug 163340.8Ordained BishopBishop of Seckau, Austria
3 Feb 166471.2DiedBishop of Seckau, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johannes Markus von Aldringen
Bishop Johannes Markus von Aldringen (born , died ) Bishop of Seckau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuxembourg

  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 308
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017