Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Li Shan

Bishop of Beijing [Peking], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1965³ Born
21 Dec 198924.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 200742.3SelectedBishop of Beijing [Peking], China
21 Sep 200742.5Ordained BishopBishop of Beijing [Peking], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Li Shan
Bishop Joseph Li Shan (born Mar 1965) Bishop of Beijing [Peking]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPeking, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast