Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Damian Hartard von Leyen-Hohengeroldseck

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz

Bishop of Worms


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1624BornTrier
165429.8Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
3 Jul 167551.3SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
12 Jul 167551.3SelectedBishop of Worms, Germany
24 Feb 167651.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
24 Feb 167651.9ConfirmedBishop of Worms, Germany
8 Sep 167652.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
6 Dec 167854.7DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Damian Hartard von Leyen-Hohengeroldseck:
Archbishop Damian Hartard von Leyen-Hohengeroldseck (born , died ) Archbishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 24.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 271, and Page 419
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015