Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Albergati

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bisceglie, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1566Born
2 Aug 160942.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 160942.8AppointedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
23 Aug 160942.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
26 Apr 161043.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
15 Sep 162154.9AppointedApostolic Collector to Portugal
1624²57.2ResignedApostolic Collector to Portugal
1627¹60.2ResignedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
13 Jan 1634³67.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Bisceglie, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Albergati (VIAF: 57408261)
Bishop Antonio Albergati (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bisceglie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologne

  • a priest for 24.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 368
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 47, Number 257
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,609, Number 22
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 249
  • b not a: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast