Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gereon Otto von Gutmann zu Sobernheim

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

Titular Bishop of Cyrene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1571BornKoblenz
13 Jul 161645.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
13 Jul 161645.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
9 Oct 161645.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrene
25 Sep 163867.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Gereon Otto von Gutmann zu Sobernheim:
Bishop Gereon Otto von Gutmann zu Sobernheim (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013