Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Philipp von Dernbach

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

Bishop of Würzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1619Born
22 Mar 167252.7SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
28 Jan 167555.5ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
19 May 167555.8Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jun 167555.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
Jul 167556.0SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
24 Feb 167656.6ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
22 Apr 168363.8DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Peter Philipp von Dernbach
Bishop Peter Philipp von Dernbach (born , died ) Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGaisa

  • a priest for 7.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 113, and Page 218
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,675, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast