Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Philipp von Schönborn

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz

Bishop of Worms

Bishop of Würzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1605BornEschbach
16 Aug 164237.0SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
31 Aug 164237.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Apr 164438.6ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
9 Jul 164539.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 Sep 164540.0Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
19 Nov 164742.2SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
23 Aug 164944.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
17 May 166357.7SelectedBishop of Worms, Germany
12 Nov 166358.2ConfirmedBishop of Worms, Germany
12 Feb 167367.5DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Philipp von Schönborn:
Archbishop Johann Philipp von Schönborn (born , died ) Archbishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 27.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 39
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 201, and Page 245
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 373

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 8 Apr 2015