Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Pelking (Pelcking), O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

Titular Bishop of Cardicium

Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1573BornMünster
159117.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
20 Dec 159724.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
16 Dec 161946.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
16 Dec 161946.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
16 Dec 161946.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
16 Dec 161946.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cardicium
3 May 162046.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cardicium
28 Dec 164269.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Pelking (Pelcking):
Bishop Johannes Pelking (Pelcking) O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 135

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014