Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Bruti

Deceased

Bishop of Novigrad (Cittanova)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1627BornCapodistria
12 Apr 165931.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 167143.7AppointedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
19 Jul 167143.8Ordained BishopBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
Nov 1679³52.1DiedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Bruti:
Bishop Giacomo Bruti (born , died Nov 1679) Bishop of Novigrad (Cittanova)

  • a priest for 20.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 70
  • b: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015