Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Paweł Lenga, M.I.C.

Bishop Emeritus of Karaganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1950 BornHorodok, Ukraine
28 May 198030.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
13 Apr 199141.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kazakhstan
13 Apr 199141.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Arba
28 May 199141.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arba
7 Jul 199949.3AppointedBishop of Karaganda, Kazakhstan
17 May 200353.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Karaganda, Kazakhstan
5 Feb 201160.9ResignedBishop of Karaganda, Kazakhstan

MicroData Summary for Jan Paweł Lenga:
Archbishop Jan Paweł Lenga M.I.C. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Karaganda

Please contact the Archbishop through the Diocese of Karaganda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,449
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,638
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013