Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Lefèvre de Caumartin

Deceased

Bishop of Amiens


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592¹BornAmiens
4 Dec 161725.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Amiens, France
4 Dec 161725.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
17 Dec 161725.9SucceededBishop of Amiens, France
13 May 161826.3Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
27 Nov 165260.9DiedBishop of Amiens, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Lefèvre de Caumartin:
Bishop François Lefèvre de Caumartin (died ) Bishop of Amiens

  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 80, and Page 202
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1618, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 18 Feb 2015