Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Bonzi

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Béziers

Titular Bishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1591¹BornFirenze
31 Aug 161524.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Béziers, France
31 Aug 161524.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
31 Jan 161625.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
30 Apr 162130.3DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Béziers, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Bonzi:
Bishop Domenico Bonzi (died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Béziers

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 116, and Page 126
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 59, Number 341
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Feb 2015