Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wiesław Lechowicz

Auxiliary Bishop of Tarnów

Titular Bishop of Lambiridi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1962 BornDąbrowa Tarnowska
24 May 198724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Tarnów, Poland
22 Dec 200745.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland
22 Dec 200745.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lambiridi
16 Feb 200845.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lambiridi

MicroData Summary for Wiesław Lechowicz:
Bishop Wiesław Lechowicz (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tarnów

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tarnów.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,676

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013