Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josip Lang

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia

Titular Bishop of Alabanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1857Born
16 Sep 188326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Zagreb, Croatia
26 Feb 191558.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
26 Feb 191558.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Alabanda
18 Apr 191558.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alabanda
1 Nov 192467.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Josip Lang
Bishop Josip Lang (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBregi

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,925
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 41
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,915, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast