Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Bernard Allen Collier, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Port-Louis

Titular Bishop of Druzipara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1802BornRokery, Yorkshire, Great Britain
182624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
14 Feb 184038.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope {Capo de Buona Speranza}, South Africa
14 Feb 184038.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Milevum
3 May 184038.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milevum
7 Dec 184745.9AppointedBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
6 Sep 186361.7ResignedBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
22 Sep 186361.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Druzipara
21 Nov 189088.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Port-Louis, Mauritius

MicroData Summary for William Bernard Allen Collier:
Bishop William Bernard Allen Collier O.S.B. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Port-Louis

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 50.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 251, and Page 466
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 7 Nov 2014