Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Kirabo Amooti

Bishop of Hoima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1955 BornKyanaisoke
9 Sep 197923.9Ordained PriestPriest of Hoima, Uganda
30 Nov 201560.1AppointedBishop of Hoima, Uganda
28 Feb 201660.4Ordained BishopBishop of Hoima, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Vincent Kirabo Amooti
Bishop Vincent Kirabo Amooti (born ) Bishop of Hoima

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hoima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 9 Dec 2015
  • c34: CB, 11 Dec 2015
  • 2ln: CB, 26 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016