Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wenceslas Joseph Kinold, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sapporo

Titular Bishop of Panemotichus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1871BornGiershagen, Germany
1 Jul 189725.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
13 Apr 191543.7AppointedPrefect of Sapporo, Japan
18 Mar 192957.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sapporo, Japan
18 Mar 192957.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Panemotichus
9 Jun 192957.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Panemotichus
Nov 1940³69.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Sapporo, Japan
22 May 195280.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sapporo, Japan

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wenceslas Joseph Kinold:
Bishop Wenceslas Joseph Kinold O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Sapporo

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1929, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015