Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Henri Charles Breton, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fukuoka

Titular Bishop of Arabissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1882BornSaint-Inglevert, France
29 Jun 190523.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
9 Jun 193148.9AppointedBishop of Fukuoka, Japan
29 Sep 193149.2Ordained BishopBishop of Fukuoka, Japan
12 May 194158.8ResignedBishop of Fukuoka, Japan
12 May 194158.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Arabissus
12 Aug 195472.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Fukuoka, Japan

MicroData Summary for Albert Henri Charles Breton:
Bishop Albert Henri Charles Breton M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fukuoka

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013