Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Raffaele Bernacchioni, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Agra, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1854Born
24 Oct 187117.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
7 Aug 191763.3AppointedArchbishop of Agra, India
27 Dec 191763.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Agra, India
21 Aug 193783.4DiedArchbishop of Agra, India

MicroData Summary for Angelo Raffaele Bernacchioni
Archbishop Angelo Raffaele Bernacchioni O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop of Agra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFigline Valdarno

  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 40
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast