Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Taiji Katsuya

Bishop of Sapporo, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1955 Born
29 Apr 198630.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sapporo, Japan
22 Jun 201357.5AppointedBishop of Sapporo, Japan
14 Oct 201357.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sapporo, Japan

MicroData Summary for Bernard Taiji Katsuya
Bishop Bernard Taiji Katsuya (born ) Bishop of Sapporo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuroran-Hokkaido

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sapporo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2013
  • ob: CB, 26 Jun 2013
  • c2+: CB, 14 Oct 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2013, Number 143
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,976

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast