Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Daisuke Narui, S.V.D.

Bishop of Niigata, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1973 Born
9 Mar 200026.2Perpetual VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
10 Mar 200127.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
31 May 202046.5AppointedBishop of Niigata, Japan
22 Sep 202046.8Ordained BishopBishop of Niigata, Japan

MicroData Summary for Paul Daisuke Narui
Bishop Paul Daisuke Narui S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Niigata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIwakura, Diocese of Nagoya
Ordained PriestChurch, Nanzan, Diocese of Nagoya
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Niigata, Diocese of Niigata

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Niigata.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 21 Jun 2020
  • ob: CB, 22 Jun 2020
  • c34: CB, 17 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 23 Sep 2020

Quantcast