Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Kahhalé Zouhaïraty, B.A.

Apostolic Exarch of Venezuela (Melkite Greek)

Titular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1938 BornAlep
2 Feb 196627.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
12 Oct 199557.2AppointedApostolic Exarch of Venezuela (Melkite Greek)
12 Oct 199557.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae
21 Dec 199557.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae

MicroData Summary for Georges Kahhalé Zouhaïraty:
Bishop Georges Kahhalé Zouhaïraty B.A. (born ) Apostolic Exarch of Venezuela

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Exarchate of Venezuela (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,636
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 19 Jan 2014