Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hilarion Capucci, B.A. †

Deceased

Patriarchal Vicar Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine

Titular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina dei Greco-Melkiti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1922Born
20 Jul 194725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
30 Jul 196543.4AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine
30 Jul 196543.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina dei Greco-Melkiti
5 Sep 196543.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina dei Greco-Melkiti
1974²51.8ResignedPatriarchal Vicar of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine
1 Jan 201794.8DiedPatriarchal Vicar Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hilarion Capucci (VIAF: 43113650)
Archbishop Hilarion Capucci B.A. (born , died ) Patriarchal Vicar Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep

  • a priest for 69.4 years
  • a bishop for 51.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 1 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jul 2017