Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop János Horváth

Deceased

Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1769BornCsicsó
20 Aug 179222.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Nov 179223.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Feb 183060.3SelectedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
30 Sep 183161.9ConfirmedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
18 Dec 183162.1Ordained BishopBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
16 Jan 183565.2DiedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary

MicroData Summary for János Horváth:
Bishop János Horváth (born , died ) Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1835
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013