Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Séverin Haller, C.R.A. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Saint-Maurice

Titular Bishop of Bethleem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1895BornLa Tour-de-Peilz
191317.8ProfessedMember of Swiss Congregation of Canons Regular of Saint Maurice of Agaune
25 Feb 192025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Swiss Congregation of Canons Regular of Saint Maurice of Agaune
14 Jun 194348.3SelectedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
26 Jun 194348.3ConfirmedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
26 Jun 194348.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
10 Aug 194348.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethleem
23 Jul 197075.4RetiredAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
17 Jul 198792.4DiedAbbot Emeritus of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Louis-Séverin Haller:
Bishop Louis-Séverin Haller C.R.A. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Saint-Maurice

  • a priest for 67.3 years
  • a bishop for 43.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015