Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Rubén Darío Jaramillo Montoya

Bishop-Elect of Buenaventura, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1966 Born
4 Oct 199226.1Ordained PriestPriest of Pereira, Colombia
30 Jun 201750.8AppointedBishop of Buenaventura, Colombia
29 Jul 201750.9Ordained BishopBishop of Buenaventura, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Rubén Darío Jaramillo Montoya
Father Rubén Darío Jaramillo Montoya (born ) Bishop-Elect of Buenaventura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Rosa de Cabal, Diocese of Pereira
Ordained BishopNuestra Senora de la Pobreza, Cathedral, Pereira, Diocese of Pereira

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Buenaventura.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2017
  • ob: CB, 5 Jul 2017
  • c2: CB, 12 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jul 2017