Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Rigg

Deceased

Bishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1814Born
25 Jul 183824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Eastern District, Scotland, Great Britain
22 Mar 187863.6AppointedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
26 May 187863.8Ordained BishopBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
18 Jan 188772.4DiedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for George Rigg
Bishop George Rigg (born , died ) Bishop of Dunkeld

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCroghmore, Irongray, Dumfries, Vicariate Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland
Ordained PriestScots, College, Valladolid, Diocese of Valladolid, Spain
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceSt. John, Church, Perth, Perth and Kinross, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)St. John, Church, Perth, Perth and Kinross, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 254
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 28
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast