Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias Joseph Isuja

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dodoma, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1929Born
24 Dec 196031.3Ordained PriestPriest of Dodoma, Tanzania
26 Jun 197242.8AppointedBishop of Dodoma, Tanzania
17 Sep 197243.0Ordained BishopBishop of Dodoma, Tanzania
15 Jan 200575.4RetiredBishop of Dodoma, Tanzania
13 Apr 201686.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Dodoma, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Matthias Joseph Isuja
Bishop Matthias Joseph Isuja (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dodoma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHaubi

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 43.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 13 Apr 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast