Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Huang Shoucheng

Deceased

Bishop of Xiapu [Funing], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Mindong)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1923Born
26 Jun 194925.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jan 198561.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Xiapu [Funing], China
25 Aug 200582.0SucceededBishop of Xiapu [Funing], China
30 Jul 201693.0DiedBishop of Xiapu [Funing], China

MicroData Summary for Vincent Huang Shoucheng
Bishop Vincent Huang Shoucheng (born , died ) Bishop of Xiapu [Funing]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKangcuo near Fu’ an
Death PlaceMindong, Diocese of Xiapu [Funing]

  • a priest for 67.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Sep 2018
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2,017, Page 1,140
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,717
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,056
  • b/c12: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast