Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Zhou Shanfu (Zhou Fangji)

Deceased

Bishop of Yixian [Yihsien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1915²Born
1944²29.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jun 198166.4Ordained BishopBishop of Yixian [Yihsien], China
5 Jan 198974.0DiedBishop of Yixian [Yihsien], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francis Zhou Shanfu (Zhou Fangji)
Bishop Francis Zhou Shanfu (Zhou Fangji) (born 1915, died ) Bishop of Yixian [Yihsien]

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast