Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carmelo Valenti, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1798BornMarineo
25 Mar 181820.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
23 Mar 182224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
27 Sep 185860.6AppointedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
3 Oct 185860.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
22 Sep 188284.6DiedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carmelo Valenti:
Bishop Carmelo Valenti C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 374
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013