Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Higinio Madalengoitia y Sanz de Zárate

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1774Born
2 Aug 179824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Trujillo, Peru
4 Nov 183965.4SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Trujillo, Peru
27 Oct 184066.4ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Trujillo, Peru
27 Oct 184066.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Antiphellus
12 Apr 184166.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antiphellus
11 Jul 184571.1SelectedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
19 Jan 184671.6ConfirmedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
4 Nov 184874.4DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Higinio Madalengoitia y Sanz de Zárate
Bishop José Higinio Madalengoitia y Sanz de Zárate (born , died ) Bishop of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrujillo, Diocese of Trujillo
Ordained BishopTrujillo, Diocese of Trujillo

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LB, 6 Feb 2013
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 81, and Page 379
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1841, Number 14
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast