Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Anthony Llanos

Bishop of Saint John’s-Basseterre, Virgin Islands (British), Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1958 Born
23 Jun 199133.3Ordained PriestPriest of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
13 Jul 201355.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
13 Jul 201355.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae Nigrae
14 Sep 201355.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae Nigrae
20 Jun 201658.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Saint John’s-Basseterre, Virgin Islands (British), Antilles
18 Dec 201860.8AppointedBishop of Saint John’s-Basseterre, Virgin Islands (British), Antilles
3 Feb 201961.0InstalledBishop of Saint John’s-Basseterre, Virgin Islands (British), Antilles

MicroData Summary for Robert Anthony Llanos
Bishop Robert Anthony Llanos (born ) Bishop of Saint John’s-Basseterre

EventPlace
Birth PlacePort of Spain
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Fatima, Church, Curepe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint John’s-Basseterre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jul 2013
  • ob: CB, 14 Jul 2013
  • c2+: CB, 8 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,868
  • ab: CB, 20 Jul 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Dec 2018
  • i: CB, 18 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 19 Dec 2018

Quantcast