Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Joseph Gilbert, C.SS.R.

Archbishop Emeritus of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1936 Born
2 Aug 195922.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Aug 196225.6Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
21 Jun 196427.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
1 Jul 199457.5AppointedBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles
7 Sep 199457.6Ordained BishopBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles
13 Mar 200164.2AppointedArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
5 May 200164.3InstalledArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
26 Dec 201175.0RetiredArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Edward Joseph Gilbert
Archbishop Edward Joseph Gilbert C.SS.R. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Port of Spain

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrooklyn, NY, USA

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Port of Spain.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,362
  • prof/perp: CB, 17 Nov 2011
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 19 Oct 2017