Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Camillo Guindani (Guindari)

Deceased

Bishop of Bergamo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1834Born
10 Aug 185722.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 187238.2AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
19 Jan 187338.3Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
19 Sep 187944.9AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
21 Oct 190470.0DiedBishop of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Camillo Guindani (Guindari) (VIAF: 88839123)
Bishop Gaetano Camillo Guindani (Guindari) (born , died ) Bishop of Bergamo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCremona, Diocese of Cremona
Ordained BishopCremona, Diocese of Cremona

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 147, and Page 163
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1873, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017