Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abbondio Cavadini, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mangalore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1846Born
1867¹20.9ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
1876¹29.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
10 Oct 189549.6SelectedBishop of Mangalore, India
26 Nov 189549.8ConfirmedBishop of Mangalore, India
28 Jun 189650.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mangalore, India
26 Mar 191064.1DiedBishop of Mangalore, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Abbondio Cavadini (VIAF: 315964557)
Bishop Abbondio Cavadini S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Mangalore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalcinate, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bergamo, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy
Death PlaceMangalore, Diocese of Mangalore

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1910
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 363
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1896, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017