Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Guidiccioni (Jr.)

Deceased

Bishop of Lucca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1557¹Born
27 Nov 160043.9AppointedBishop of Lucca, Italy
8 Dec 160043.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lucca, Italy
16 Mar 163780.2DiedBishop of Lucca, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Guidiccioni (Jr.):
Bishop Alessandro Guidiccioni (Jr.) (died ) Bishop of Lucca

  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 223
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 37, Number 186

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013