Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lazzaro Carafino

Deceased

Bishop of Como


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590¹BornCremonae
19 Dec 162233.0AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
28 Dec 162233.0Ordained BishopBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
7 Jan 162636.0AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
15 Jun 1665³75.5DiedBishop of Como, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lazzaro Carafino:
Bishop Lazzaro Carafino (died ) Bishop of Como

  • a bishop for 42.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 238, and Page 158
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 78, Number 463

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013