Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Federico Cardinal Borromeo (Sr.)

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1564BornMilan
18 Dec 158723.3Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 158823.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
9 Jan 158924.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
20 Mar 158924.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
14 Jan 159126.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
17 Sep 159329.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
7 Dec 159329.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 159530.7AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
11 Jun 159530.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
21 Sep 163167.1DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico Borromeo (Sr.):
Cardinal Federico Borromeo (Sr.) (born , died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
  • a cardinal for 43.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1587
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013