Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Poggi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ripatransone


Events

DateEventTitle
7 May 1607AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
20 May 1607Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
1620¹ResignedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
8 May 1628DiedBishop Emeritus of Ripatransone, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Poggi:
Bishop Sebastiano Poggi (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ripatransone

  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 296
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 22 Feb 2015