Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Parma, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1555¹Born
31 Jan 161156.0AppointedBishop of Castro [del Lazio], Italy
24 Feb 161156.1Ordained BishopBishop of Castro [del Lazio], Italy
9 Jul 161459.5AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
24 Mar 161560.2DiedBishop of Parma, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Rossi
Bishop Alessandro Rossi (born 1555, died ) Bishop of Parma

  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 275, and Page 140
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 49, Number 272
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1611, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast