Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vito De Grisantis

Deceased

Bishop of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1941BornLecce
27 Jun 196523.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 May 200058.7AppointedBishop of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca, Italy
26 Jun 200058.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca, Italy
29 Jul 200058.9InstalledBishop of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca, Italy
1 Apr 201068.6DiedBishop of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vito De Grisantis:
Bishop Vito De Grisantis (born , died ) Bishop of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,794
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015