Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Joseph Green de Saint-Marsault

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Pergamum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1727¹BornLimoges
12 Jul 177952.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Pergamum
8 Aug 177952.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pergamum
2 Sep 181891.6DiedTitular Bishop of Pergamum

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marie-Joseph Green de Saint-Marsault:
Bishop Marie-Joseph Green de Saint-Marsault (born 1727, died ) Titular Bishop of Pergamum

  • a bishop for 39.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 333
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1779, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015