Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Borgognini

Deceased

Bishop of Montalcino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1651³BornSienna
28 Nov 169544.0AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
4 Dec 169544.0Ordained BishopBishop of Montalcino, Italy
Nov 1726³74.9DiedBishop of Montalcino, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Borgognini:
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Borgognini (born , died Nov 1726) Bishop of Montalcino

  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 227
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 1 May 2015